+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (54)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 03/17/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/26/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 27, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor