+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 6, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 31, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 28, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 31
March 25, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor