+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 03/15/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed State Administration
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed State Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/26/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 21, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor