+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Tabled in Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Legal Review Note
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On March 7, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor