+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 04/09/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Taken from Table in Committee Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/25/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 21, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor