+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Rereferred to Committee
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On October 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On September 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 14
March 24, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
March 23, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 10
March 22, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor