+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
On November 23, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor