+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/09/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
- First Reading
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 02/26/2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning on 01/26/2021
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning on 01/25/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning on 01/22/2021
- Hearing scheduled in committee Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning on 01/22/2021
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning on 01/21/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Appropriations
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On December 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 22, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 21, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 18, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor