+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Robert (Bob) Mehlhoff
Type:
Primary Sponsor