+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (57)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 03/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/25/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 21, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor