+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/05/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business and Labor
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 01/17/2019
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On November 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 2, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On August 1, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Ryan Lynch
Type:
Primary Sponsor