+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- First Reading
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 27, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On October 23, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On September 26, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On September 15, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 21, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor