+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations on 02/24/2021
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 13, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 23, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor