+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor