+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 52
March 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor