+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On December 29, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor