+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (63)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Highways and Transportation
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Highways and Transportation
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Highways and Transportation on 03/21/2019
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Highways and Transportation
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Transportation
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Transportation
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Transportation on 02/22/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Transportation
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Rhonda Knudsen
Type:
Primary Sponsor