+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 31, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 4, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor