+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Human Services
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Human Services
- Amendments Available
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 02/24/2021
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Referred to Committee Human Services
- First Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor