+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Fiscal Note Received
- Tabled in Committee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Legal Review Note
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor