+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 14, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2015: AMD-001 Lieser D/PASS
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 19
February 25, 2015: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 52
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor