+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor