+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Fish, Wildlife and Parks
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Fish, Wildlife and Parks
- Taken from Table in Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks on 02/21/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
- Introduced
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bob Brown
Type:
Primary Sponsor