+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 22, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 21, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On October 29, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 28, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 10
April 27, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 22
April 27, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 5
April 26, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
April 7, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 11
April 6, 2011: AMD-1 Kaufmann D/PASS
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor