+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
- Hearing
On February 12, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Michael (Mike) More
Type:
Primary Sponsor