+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (54)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 11, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor