+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/31/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/22/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor