+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (57)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor