+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Judiciary
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/27/2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/21/2019
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jade Bahr
Type:
Primary Sponsor