+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (72)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 2, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 04/15/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended State Administration
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended State Administration
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/17/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/01/2021
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Legislative Administration
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Amendments Available
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Legislative Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee Legislative Administration on 02/22/2021
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Legislative Administration
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Introduced
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 14, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 13, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor