+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Taken from Table in Committee
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 17, 2013: Do Concur with SA
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
April 16, 2013: Do Concur with SA
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
April 8, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
April 6, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 5
April 4, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor