+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft Taken by Drafter
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor