+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 16
April 21, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 10
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 19
March 27, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 2
March 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
March 24, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor