+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/20/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 9, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bob Brown
Type:
Primary Sponsor