+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/12/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 22, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mary Ann Dunwell
Type:
Primary Sponsor