+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed Consideration
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
April 15, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
April 14, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
April 8, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 25, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2015: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 44
March 24, 2015: AMD-001 Olszewski D/PASS
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 46
March 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor