+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 2, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
March 25, 2013: Do Concur with SA
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 7
March 23, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 10
February 21, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
February 18, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Gerald (Jerry) Bennett
Type:
Primary Sponsor