+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (56)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/22/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/19/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Matt Regier
Type:
Primary Sponsor