+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (61)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Education and Cultural Resources
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 03/15/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Education
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Education
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 02/24/2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Referred to Committee Education
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 13, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor