+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 14
February 28, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
February 21, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor