+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On July 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor