+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (76)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Conference on 04/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed Conference
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Finance and Claims
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 03/14/2019
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 02/13/2019
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Appropriations
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On September 12, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Frederick (Eric) Moore
Type:
Primary Sponsor