+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 22, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor