+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Fish and Game
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Fish and Game
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 04/04/2019
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- First Reading
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks on 02/19/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 16, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Marilyn Marler
Type:
Primary Sponsor