+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
March 19, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
March 18, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
February 22, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor