+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Printed - New Version Available
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On February 5, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor