+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On May 28, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Vote
February 14, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor