+ − Full Texts (20)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 12, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 22, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (H) Motion Failed
- (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed
On February 19, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 14, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Hearing
On February 13, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Fiscal Note Received
- (H) Fiscal Note Signed
- (H) Fiscal Note Printed
On February 10, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Referred to Committee
- (H) First Reading
On February 7, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester
- (H) Introduced
- (H) Fiscal Note Requested
On February 5, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 4, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
- (LC) Draft in Assembly
On February 3, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Edit
- (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 31, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Drafter Assigned
- (LC) Draft in Legal Review
On January 28, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
- (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
- (LC) Draft in Assembly
- (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 27, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Edit
On January 26, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Legal Review
On December 10, 2024 in the House:
- (LC) Drafter Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2025: (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed - AMD-HB0429.002.002 Buttrey DO PASS
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 54
February 22, 2025: (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed - Do Pass
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 59
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor