+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft On Hold
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
March 4, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor