+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee
- Hearing
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 28, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 14, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 46
February 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor